Accounts and annual returns REDEEMING OUR COMMUNITIES

Charity number: 1139817
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window