Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY CHOLSEY
Charity number: 1138273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Mills | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Hammond | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Andy Avery | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Bolt | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Alex Hammond | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Irene McClure | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rose Noorduijn | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosie PRICE | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Singh | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.