Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN'S CHURCH, SOUTH LAMBETH
Charity number: 1138630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Comfort Idowu-Fearon | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Nikol Gashi | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Christiana Dora Valcarcel | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev STEPHEN HUGH COULSON | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Happy Ighofose Emuveyan | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
JAMES GEORGE WILSON | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Eric Mamah-Djiman | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
PENELOPE JEAN ELVIN | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||
ROSALIE DONNA GRANT | Trustee | 03 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
NUSI AMADE-JAJI | Trustee | 04 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Rosalind Eileen Margaret Hallifax | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.