Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WILFRID, CHICHESTER
Charity number: 1138423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Nicholas Dunn | Chair | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Kathleen Brand | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Ann Godfrey | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Clarke | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeannette Knott | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Woods | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jas Osborne | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Vann | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Gay | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Gale-Chambers | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Elizabeth Thorpe | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Barbara Gale | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Beddoes | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Foakes | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MRS J SIMMONS | Trustee | 05 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.