AL HABIB WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020
Total gross income £9.80k £9.79k £8.90k £9.33k £9.80k
Total expenditure £9.80k £9.79k £8.50k £9.33k £9.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A