Accounts and annual returns THE CAGYS TRUST

Charity number: 1139237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required Download Open in new window