ALFURQAN EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1142790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 June 2018 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 June 2018 128 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 February 2017 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 April 2017 84 days late Download