Accounts and annual returns ADAPT PREMBABIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1138777
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 03 August 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 03 August 2022 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 August 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 16 August 2019 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 July 2018 1 days late Download Open in new window