TAMWORTH IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1141899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 22 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 22 March 2021 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 04 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 06 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 09 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required