TAMWORTH IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1141899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £1.83k £0 £10.91k £24.85k £7.46k
Total expenditure £5.21k £1.39k £793 £28.82k £11.76k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A