Financial history SPEAKERS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1139377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £953.93k £995.62k £1.24m £881.36k £716.74k
Total expenditure £957.54k £1.09m £1.22m £862.79k £703.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £39.73k
Income - Donations and legacies £22.96k £39.01k £36.52k £105.82k £92.78k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £924.91k £953.93k £1.19m £770.09k £618.37k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.07k £2.63k £3.52k £5.07k £5.25k
Income - Other £3.00k £55 £354 £373 £353
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £932.98k £1.06m £1.19m £840.86k £683.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds £24.56k £25.78k £31.10k £21.92k £20.05k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £8.44k £4.90k £4.84k £4.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0