BARNET COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1139376
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £143.39k £157.19k £83.94k £93.54k £81.76k
Total expenditure £150.65k £161.16k £80.50k £78.46k £85.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.04k £9.86k £7.72k £2.72k £1.50k