BLAST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 02 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 02 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 04 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 19 July 2021 322 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 21 January 2020 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 26 September 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 05 October 2017 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required