BLAST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £15.75k £9.40k £24.13k £27.42k £29.62k
Total expenditure £22.40k £13.94k £24.94k £28.55k £26.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A