TLC - ST LUKE'S

Charity number: 1141796
Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £107.40k £84.05k £102.13k £67.97k £77.49k
Total expenditure £113.96k £98.67k £83.14k £84.00k £70.86k
Income from government contracts £30.28k £30.28k £30.28k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.32k £40.37k £53.54k