Financial history AKAMBA CHILDREN'S EDUCATION FUND

Charity number: 1139880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £23.56k £52.88k £23.29k £21.33k £17.38k
Total expenditure £24.80k £67.04k £12.63k £30.29k £23.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A