Financial history CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND

Charity number: 1140097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £167.33m £188.25m £175.44m £134.82m £148.13m
Total expenditure £285.80m £137.87m £289.02m £319.64m £226.34m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.00m £2.47m £2.02m £1.20m £1.19m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £163.98m £183.66m £171.50m £132.48m £144.79m
Income - Other £1.35m £2.12m £1.92m £1.14m £2.14m
Income - Legacies £86.77k £0 £4.84k £0 £659
Expenditure - Charitable activities £226.21m £74.88m £211.78m £244.08m £142.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £59.59m £62.99m £77.24m £75.56m £84.16m
Expenditure - Governance £1.17m £1.32m £1.52m £1.33m £1.85m
Expenditure - Grants institution £118.52m £0 £88.36m £138.69m £120.98m
Expenditure - Investment management £59.59m £62.68m £76.78m £75.56m £84.16m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0