WALK-IN-SPACE

Charity number: 1142954
Charity reporting is overdue by 423 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 58 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 58 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 423 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 423 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 March 2020 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 12 December 2017 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required