ADDAS CENTRE

Charity number: 1140763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 January 2020 348 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 February 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 May 2017 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required