Financial history TIPTREE YOUTH PROJECT OUTREACH

Charity number: 1141995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £28.87k £25.52k £5.90k £33.34k £13.88k
Total expenditure £31.84k £28.97k £1.00k £9.65k £19.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £1.00k N/A N/A £3.00k