Accounts and annual returns ALL HANDS AND HEARTS ( UK ) TRUST

Charity number: 1139938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 July 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 20 July 2020 20 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 July 2019 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 31 July 2019 31 days late
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 17 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window