FLEX-UK

Charity number: 1142663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £5.03k £40 £1.71k £0 £7.44k
Total expenditure £5.33k £2.18k £2.50k £595 £6.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A