Financial history AFRICAN VILLAGE SCHOOL FUND (AVSF)

Charity number: 1140971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/01/2018 04/01/2019 04/01/2020 04/01/2021 04/01/2022
Total gross income £2.61k £19.82k £23.35k £4.28k £12.47k
Total expenditure £2.41k £18.96k £17.13k £2.82k £5.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A