Trustees MERSEYSIDE JEWISH REPRESENTATIVE COUNCIL
Charity number: 1140569
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy George Wolfson | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Howard Simon | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Keith Rae | Trustee | 24 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mark Levinson | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
AVRIL KAY LEWIS | Trustee | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARRY MARK LEVENE | Trustee | 23 June 2011 |
|
|||||
MICHELLE HAYWARD | Trustee | 23 June 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.