FIRST CHOICE HOUSING

Charity number: 1139863
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 21 December 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 01 January 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 20 March 2019 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 20 March 2019 475 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 20 March 2019 840 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required