FIRST CHOICE HOUSING

Charity number: 1139863
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £17.59k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £12.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £9.76k