FRIENDS OF KENNINGTON CE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1140506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.11k £8.41k £6.29k £8.73k £8.58k
Total expenditure £5.53k £10.23k £7.00k £7.85k £5.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A