Accounts and annual returns DURHAM ACTION ON SINGLE HOUSING LTD

Charity number: 501556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window