Trustees DURHAM ACTION ON SINGLE HOUSING LTD

Charity number: 501556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gary Eaborn Chair 30 October 2018
None on record
Becky Craven Trustee 22 April 2022
None on record
Clive Rook Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Mike Costello Trustee 30 November 2021
None on record
Peter Samuel Trustee 30 November 2021
None on record
William Manners Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Marie Roe Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Mark Reid Trustee 26 November 2019
None on record
Ruth Craige Trustee 30 July 2019
None on record
Victoria Halliday Trustee 28 May 2019
None on record
Catherine Jane Curry Trustee 27 October 2015
None on record