Governing document Keeping Children Safe
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 APR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JUN 2016 as amended on 31 Jul 2020 as amended on 14 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE OF CHILDREN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY INCREASING THE SAFEGUARDS OFFERED TO THEM THROUGH IMPROVED CHILD PROTECTION POLICIES AND PRACTICE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.