Accounts and annual returns GLYNCOCH COMMUNITY REGENERATION LTD

Charity number: 1142855
Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window