Accounts and annual returns THE AFRICAN ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1141553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2021 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 December 2021 313 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window