Financial history CHASDEI AHARON LIMITED

Charity number: 1142565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £895.52k £3.01m £2.65m £3.38m £6.07m
Total expenditure £810.73k £3.05m £2.69m £3.32m £5.74m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £895.52k £3.01m £2.65m £3.38m £6.07m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £810.73k £3.05m £2.69m £3.32m £5.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.28k £8.96k £14.11k £17.52k £14.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £730.58k £2.88m £2.51m £3.30m £5.40m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0