THE ANGEL ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
community orchestra
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Juliet Fowler | Chair | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES MARY THERESA HUGHES | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Murray Shielswood Scott | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Katharine Caird | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/03/2018 | 17/03/2019 | 17/03/2020 | 17/03/2021 | 17/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.00k | £18.94k | £4.00k | £4.66k | £12.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.58k | £17.92k | £4.57k | £10.23k | £11.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 March 2019 | 05 January 2021 | 354 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 March 2018 | 30 December 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 02 FEB 2011
Charitable objects
The objects of the society shall be: 1. to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public concerts and recitals; 2. to further such charitable purpose or purposes as the trustees in their absolute discretion shall think fit but in particular through the making of grants and donations.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 BURMA ROAD
LONDON
N16 9BJ
- Phone:
- 07786111398
- Email:
- PAULINEFOWLER@FASTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window