LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST

Charity number: 1141797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Smith Trustee 14 March 2021
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
THE PERCY BARTLETT TRUST Received: On time
Linda Craig Trustee 01 January 2020
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
David Robson Trustee 23 July 2018
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
Denise James- Mason Trustee 01 January 2021
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
Randal Barker Trustee 01 January 2019
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
Christine Downes Grainger Trustee 23 July 2018 None on record
Thomas Rowlands Trustee 23 July 2018
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
Jenny Moy Trustee 01 January 2019
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
Peter Daniels Trustee 01 January 2019
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
Oliver Griffiths Trustee 01 January 2021
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
Michael Charles Trustee 01 January 2020
LONDON WEST AREA QUAKER MEETING
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
Susan Balmer Trustee 21 February 2021
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
Jonathan Stephen Pettigrew Trustee 22 January 2020 None on record
Sarah Totterdell Trustee 01 January 2019
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
BERNADETTE O'SHEA Trustee 23 July 2018
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time
Richard Martin Trustee 23 July 2018
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST Received: On time