Financial history MUHAMMADIYAH HOUSE OF WISDOM

Charity number: 1145770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £156.26k £94.42k £141.77k £65.15k £116.68k
Total expenditure £58.69k £123.06k £183.95k £38.27k £139.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A