Trustees THE PORTICO LIBRARY AND NEWSROOM
Charity number: 1143639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Ann Whitehead | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Kevin Dalton-Johnson | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Olivia Lisk-Carew | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Chancellor | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
HeatherEliska Gray | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Allan | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Randhir Siri Senapala | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Christopher Cooper | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louisa Jayne Yates | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Carpenter | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ken Phillips | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANTHONY PETER DONAJGRODZKI | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ann Graham | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr DOROTHY JOAN CLAYTON | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Reinmar Hager | Trustee | 20 March 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.