Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL & ALL ANGELS WITH ST EDMUND, NORTHAMPTON.

Charity number: 1143466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £125.08k £160.36k £149.80k £119.48k £114.75k
Total expenditure £142.01k £159.57k £202.59k £129.07k £132.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A