SOLID ROCK TRIUMPHANT MINISTRY UK

Charity number: 1143444
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £72.66k £96.15k £17.83k £21.46k £9.76k
Total expenditure £69.32k £83.77k £17.01k £20.45k £10.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A