Accounts and annual returns LEICESTER SHRI MURUGAN (HINDU) TEMPLE

Charity number: 1141315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 21 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 09 November 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 14 October 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 21 November 2018 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required