Trustees GUY PILKINGTON BENEFIT FUND

Charity number: 501684
Charity reporting is overdue by 143 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN HOLBROOK Chair 31 March 2020
None on record
MARGARET GREENALL Trustee 20 March 2023
None on record
Karen Wycherley Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Cynthia Penketh Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Geoff Hunter Trustee 17 June 2019
RAINFORD SILVER BAND
Received: On time
Susan Brandreth Trustee 31 October 2013
None on record
WILLIAM HADFIELD SIMM Trustee
None on record