THE VINCENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1153457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £508.91k £497.79k £587.04k £836.38k £657.44k
Total expenditure £649.25k £532.54k £636.37k £665.43k £618.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £439.47k N/A £559.24k £694.72k £543.30k
Income - Other trading activities £22.40k N/A £23.42k £22.84k £20.07k
Income - Charitable activities £41.67k N/A £0 £113.30k £39.85k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.36k N/A £4.24k £5.10k £0
Income - Other £0 N/A £152 £28.36k £54.23k
Income - Legacies £71.88k N/A £151.98k £368.18k £188.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £463.09k N/A £430.53k £437.03k £381.64k
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.83k N/A £20.01k £31.15k £35.42k
Expenditure - Governance £15.40k N/A £10.01k £8.44k £4.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £191.41k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £174.34k N/A £185.83k £197.25k £201.56k