BATHEASTON NEW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1141946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.46k £8.62k £85.13k £40.93k £13.57k
Total expenditure £8.28k £3.65k £3.74k £6.54k £58.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £75.00k N/A N/A