BATHEASTON NEW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1141946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samantha Jane Packer Trustee 12 October 2018 None on record
Michael John Corbett Trustee 11 October 2018 None on record
Catherine Ann McCarthy Trustee 16 November 2017 None on record
Ruth Anne Foreman Trustee 12 October 2018 None on record
PAMELA ALFREDA MAY BURCOMBE Trustee 17 May 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATHEASTON ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH ST. CATHERINE Received: On time
George William Riley Trustee 11 October 2018 None on record
Peter David Fear Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record