DAUGHTERS OF DIVINE LOVE TRAINING AND ASSESSMENT CENTRE (UK)

Charity number: 1146021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £25.93k £27.16k £50.99k £71.48k £82.10k
Total expenditure £18.12k £22.82k £39.16k £73.89k £62.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A