EAST LONDON COMMUNITY BAND

Charity number: 1142255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 August 2017 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 25 August 2017 56 days late Download