EAST LONDON COMMUNITY BAND

Charity number: 1142255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £26.07k £26.05k £26.87k £42.46k £33.45k
Total expenditure £22.34k £24.60k £26.88k £32.95k £42.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A