ALRIDHA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1142811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 27 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 27 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 02 August 2019 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 02 August 2019 124 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 06 June 2018 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 06 June 2018 67 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 04 August 2017 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 04 August 2017 126 days late Download