ALRIDHA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1142811
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £870.52k £667.60k £479.65k £129.96k £253.40k
Total expenditure £1.32m £1.30m £674.18k £308.83k £238.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £41.15k £20.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £517.38k £236.17k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £353.14k £431.43k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £824.89k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £106.04k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £221.39k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £569.40k £302.09k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £371.22k N/A N/A N/A