Accounts and annual returns PEMBROKE HOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1142139
Charity reporting is overdue by 1479 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 384 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 384 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 749 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 749 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1114 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1114 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1479 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1479 days